North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 4:25-cv-00058
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
M-R Electric & Security Alarms, Inc.
Defendant
Owners Insurance Company, MI
Plaintiff
Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Wesley Brian Sawyer
Murphy & Grantland, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 1 pgs order Order Redesignating Division Tue 04/01 9:33 AM
Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 7:25-CV-559-BO-KS. No further filing shall be made in 4:25-CV-58-BO-KS. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/31/2025. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 04/01 9:35 AM
Intradistrict Transfer to Southern Division. New case number - 7:25-cv-559-BO-KS. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 03/31 12:47 PM
Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 03/31 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-4] Financial Disclosure Statement. The Financial Disclosure statement is a stand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Financial Disclosure Statement using the event "OtherDocuments - Financial Disclosure Statement. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 03/31 12:53 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 10:26 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8043704.), filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Sawyer, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons - M-R Electric,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons - Owners,
Att: 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures,
Att: 5 Exhibit Complaint - Ex A,
Att: 6 Exhibit Complaint - Ex B,
Att: 7 Exhibit Complaint - Ex C,
Att: 8 Exhibit Complaint - Ex D,
Att: 9 Exhibit Complaint - Ex E