Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00465
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:216th Judicial District in Gillespie County, 24-17982
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Hillsdale College
Represented By
Eric L. Maassen
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Brantley A. Smith
Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Charlemagne Institute
Represented By
Marvin G. Pipkin
Pipkin Law
contact info
Steve Alfonso Chiscano
Gonzalez, Chiscano, Angulo & Kasson, P.C.
contact info
Nadeen Abou-Hossa
Gonzalez Chiscano Angulo & Kasson, PC
contact info
Intervenor
Forging Futures Education Fund
Represented By
Gregory B. Yost
Brock Upham Yost & Strieber, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Create Healthy Foundation
Represented By
Kevin A. Reed
Davis & Wilkerson
contact info
Norman Williams
Langley & Banack
contact info
Ryan Finnegan
Langley & Banack, Inc.
contact info
Natalie Friend Wilson
Langley & Banack, Inc
contact info
Jennifer Claymon
Reed, Claymon, Meeker, Krienke & Spurck, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 05/09 5:05 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by The Charlemagne Institute and Hillsdale College .(Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 4:27 PM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Charlemagne and Hillsdales respective deadlines to file responses to the Motion to Dismiss is May 9, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/02 12:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, to Remand by Hillsdale College, The Charlemagne Institute.(Smith, Brantley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 cmp Intervenor Complaint Fri 04/25 5:11 PM
Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Forging Futures Education Fund.(dm)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 04/25 5:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion for Leave to Intervene. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
16 16 7 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 2:03 PM
ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 04/18 8:18 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, to Remand by Create Healthy Foundation.(Wilson, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 5:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Finnegan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/15 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Original Complaint by Forging Futures Education Fund.(Yost, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Complaint,
Att: 2 Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 11:56 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Friend Wilson for Ryan Finnegan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20039943) by on behalf of Create Healthy Foundation.(Wilson, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 04/11 8:55 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Create Healthy Foundation. (Wilson, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric L. Maassen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 4:36 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brantley A. Smith on behalf of Eric L. Maassen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number CTXWDC-20010805) by on behalf of Hillsdale College, The Charlemagne Institute.(Smith, Brantley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Notice of Correction Mon 04/07 10:26 AM
Notice of Correction: re6 Supplement. *PLEASE NOTE: Your Supplement is deficient as it is not in proper pleading format pursuant to FRCP 10 (to include case style, case number and summary of the pleading), and rule 11 (no signature/block). Please note this for future filings. No further action is required at this time. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 04/04 5:45 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hillsdale College. (Smith, Brantley)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 04/04 5:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hillsdale College. (Smith, Brantley)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Supplement to Fri 04/04 9:58 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal,,, docket sheet to complete record with state court pleadings by The Charlemagne Institute. (Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 2:00 PM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Mon 03/31 2:00 PM
Order Directing Ryan Finnegan to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Mon 03/31 1:59 PM
Order Directing Jennifer Claymon to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Fri 03/28 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Hillsdale College (Smith, Brantley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/28 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Charlemagne Institute (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19974698), filed by The Charlemagne Institute.(Chiscano, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Create Healthy Foundation Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Petition filed by Ray Geistweidt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Create Healthy Foundation's Motion to Sever,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Create Healthy's Special Exceptions Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - Create Healthy Plea to the Jurisdiction 91a Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - Order to Sever,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G - Original Petition in Intervention,
Att: 8 Exhibit Hilldsdale College Petition in Intervention - Ex. H,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I - Order Granting Create Healthy MTD,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 11 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/31 1:58 PM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 03/31 1:58 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 03/31 1:59 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Create Healthy Foundation, The Charlemagne Institute. (kp)
Related: [-]