Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Case #: 1:25-cv-01002
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241in - Habeas Corpus: INS
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 2:03 PM MDT
Petitioner
Dayana (Alfredo) Munoz Ramirez
3130 N. Oakland St
Aurora, CO 80010
Represented By
Colleen Mary Cowgill
National Immigrant Justice Center
contact info
Respondent
Pamela Bondi
U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Respondent
Dawn Ceja
GEO Group, Inc. 3130 N. Oakland St
Aurora, CO 80010
Respondent
Robert Guadian
Denver ICE Field Office 12445 E. Caley Ave
Centennial, CO 80111
Respondent
Todd Lyons
U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave., SE
Washington, DC 20528
Respondent
Kristi Noem
U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave., SE
Washington, DC 20528


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 7:31 PM
NOTICE of Ratification by Petitioner Alfredo Munoz Ramirez (Cowgill, Colleen)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Minute Order Tue 04/29 5:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/29/2025. Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(a) requires the caption contain the name of all parties. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(a), "[a]n action must be prosecuted in the name of the real party in interest." Although Petitioner is captioned as Dayana Munoz Ramirez, Petitioner represents she has not legally changed her name from Alfredo Munoz Ramirez. Accordingly, the real party in interest is Alfredo Munoz Ramirez. The Court will amend the caption to reflect the real party in interest as Alfredo Munoz Ramirez a/k/a Dayana Munoz Ramirez. The Court will nevertheless refer to Petitioner by her preferred she/her pronouns. Pursuant to Rule 17(a)(3) Petitioner is ORDERED to ratify the action on or before April 30, 2025. After ratification, the action will proceed as if it had been originally commenced by the real party in interest. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 3:10 PM
REPLY to Response to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Dayana Munoz Ramirez. (Cowgill, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 5:03 PM
RESPONSE to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Robert Guadian, Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons, Dawn Ceja.(Deuschle, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 04/09 3:15 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Respondents are granted leave to file excess pages, not to exceed 20 pages, excluding the signature block and certificate of service, to their response to Petitioner's2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/9/2025. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/09 2:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Robert Guadian, Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons, Dawn Ceja. (Deuschle, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/01 10:17 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Respondents are granted a one-week extension of time, to and including 4/11/2025, to respond to Petitioner's2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Further, Petitioner is also granted an extension of time, to and including 4/18/2025, to file her reply. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/1/2025. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/31 5:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Respondents Pamela Bondi, Robert Guadian, Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons, Dawn Ceja. (Deuschle, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 03/31 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Albert Deuschle on behalf of Pamela Bondi, Robert Guadian, Kristi Noem, Todd Lyons, Dawn CejaAttorney Nicholas Albert Deuschle added to party Pamela Bondi(pty:res), Attorney Nicholas Albert Deuschle added to party Robert Guadian(pty:res), Attorney Nicholas Albert Deuschle added to party Kristi Noem(pty:res), Attorney Nicholas Albert Deuschle added to party Todd Lyons(pty:res), Attorney Nicholas Albert Deuschle added to party Dawn Ceja(pty:res) (Deuschle, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 29, 2025
minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 03/29 1:37 PM
This matter is before the Court on the2 Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. It is ORDERED that Respondents shall respond to the2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and show cause why the1 Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be granted on or before 4/04/2025. Petitioner shall file a reply on or before 4/11/2025. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez. (rmrlc4, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 03/28 2:56 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (eluce, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 03/28 2:54 PM
Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (eluce, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 03/28 1:12 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petitioner Dayana (Alfredo) Munoz Ramirez. (Cowgill, Colleen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 03/28 12:56 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number ACODC-10242695)Attorney Colleen Mary Cowgill added to party Dayana (Alfredo) Munoz Ramirez(pty:pet), filed by Dayana (Alfredo) Munoz Ramirez.(Cowgill, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Evidence Packet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet