Colorado District Court
Judge:Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01003
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:215 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:38 AM MDT
Defendant
Manuel Contreras
Represented By
Andrew D. Peterson
Jachimiak Peterson Kummer, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rocio Contreras
Represented By
Andrew D. Peterson
Jachimiak Peterson Kummer, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Panaderia Contreras, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew D. Peterson
Jachimiak Peterson Kummer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Trejo
Represented By
Jacob Aronauer
The Law Offices Of Jacob Aronauer
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
16 16 order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/09 2:30 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge15 , this case is referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/09/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/09 2:20 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo All parties consent.. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Mon 04/28 1:35 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Rocio Contreras, Manuel Contreras, Panaderia Contreras, Inc.. All Defendants. (Peterson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 12:20 PM
NOTICE Amended Affidavit of Service Executed on Panaderia Contreras, Inc.. Service made on 04/03/2025 by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 04/14 12:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Trejo. Manuel Contreras served on 4/3/2025, answer due 4/24/2025. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 04/14 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Trejo. Rocio Contreras served on 4/7/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 04/14 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Trejo. Panaderia Contreras, Inc. served on 4/7/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 misc Summons Issued Mon 03/31 10:22 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 8:47 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/28/2025. Consent Form due by 5/14/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/21/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2025 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Summons Request Fri 03/28 2:24 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Panaderia Contreras, Inc. by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Summons Request Fri 03/28 2:22 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Manuel Contreras by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Request Fri 03/28 2:21 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Rocio Contreras by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 03/28 2:16 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (echa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 03/28 2:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibits Fri 03/28 2:14 PM
Exhibits in Support Civil Cover sheet by Plaintiff Gabriel Trejo. (Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Manuel Contreras, Rocio Contreras, Panaderia Contreras, Inc. d/b/a Contreras Market (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10242855)Attorney Jacob Aronauer added to party Gabriel Trejo(pty:pla), filed by Gabriel Trejo.(Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]