Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Case #: 0:25-cv-60604
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Celtic Insurance Company
Represented By
Sky Anne Emison
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Maia Sevilla-Sharon
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Jennifer Noel Huchler
Isicoff Ragatz
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald Multispeciality PA
Represented By
Maria T. Santi
Health And Medicine Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
15 15 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 5:16 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Celtic Insurance Company. (Emison, Sky)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/02 10:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/2/2025. (nni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/01 10:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re6 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celtic Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/15/2025.(Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Emerald Multispeciality PA. Replies due by 5/5/2025. (Santi, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/24 10:37 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot8 Motion for Extension of Time, in light of9 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/24/2025. (nni)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/24 10:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/24/2025. (nni)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/24 10:02 AM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Emerald Multispeciality PA. (Santi, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 04/23 6:04 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Emerald Multispeciality PA. (Santi, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/07 2:10 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements by Emerald Multispeciality PA (Santi, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/04 3:42 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celtic Insurance Company. Responses due by 4/18/2025. (Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 3:38 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celtic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Celtic Group, Inc. for Celtic Insurance Company (Sevilla-Sharon, Maia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 04/01 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2025. (nni)
Related: [-]
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 04/01 10:12 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS. Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2025. (nni)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/31 9:18 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Fri 03/28 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18323503, filed by Celtic Insurance Company d/b/a Ambetter From Sunshine Health.(Emison, Sky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. State Court Pleadings