Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:25-cv-00617
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Case in other court:Twenty Fourth Judicial District Court, 861-756; Div A
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC
Represented By
Sean Roberts Guy
Mccraney Montagnet Quin And Noble, PLLC
contact info
William M. Quin, II
Mccraney Montagnet & Quin, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
Plaintiff
Zeruah Melecio
205 Gordon Street
Destrehan, LA 70047


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 04/24 1:16 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and this matter is consolidated with Civil Action No. 25-617, Zeruah Melecio v. ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for Monday, April 28, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. (CST). To participate in the status conference, please promptly dial at 12:55 p.m. on April 28, 2025: 833-990-9400; call ID: 912191334; pin: 042825. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send the Plaintiff a copy of this Order via first-class and certified mail at her address of record and by email below. Master Case 2:25-cv-00270-WBV-JVM c/w 25-cv-617- WBV-JVM. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/24/2025.(mmv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 motion Compel Wed 04/23 8:31 AM
MOTION to Compel Defendant to Confer in Lieu of Notice of Removal by Zeruah Melecio.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 04/23 8:27 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Removal by Zeruah Melecio. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 3:21 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the8 Motion is GRANTED. Sean R. Guy is permitted to appear as a visiting attorney for and on behalf of defendant, ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 4/7/2025. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice PHV Attorney
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 4:03 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC.(Quin, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Consent to Electronic Filing Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Sean R. Guy in Support of Motion,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 3:25 PM
**DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sean R. Guy (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10949683) by ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC.(Quin, William) Modified on 4/4/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Signed Consent Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Sean R. Guy in Support of Motion,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Thu 04/03 4:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC.(Quin, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 04/03 2:15 PM
Notice of Compliance by ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC re3 Order.(Quin, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Returns on Service of Process
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case Mon 03/31 5:00 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Brandon S. Long, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 03/31/2025.(js)(NEF: Section D, Mag 1)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 1:38 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal.(meb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 03/28 4:43 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/28 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty Fourth Judicial District Court, case number 861-756; Div A (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10940629) filed by ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC.Attorney William M. Quin, II added to party ACCU Reference Medical Laboratory, LLC(pty:dft).(Quin, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - District Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet