Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:25-cv-00345
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:41 AM EDT
defendant
Van Buren, County of
plaintiff
Demetria Booker
1812 11th St.
Elkhart, IN 46516
Represented By
Ronald W. Ryan
Lewis Reed & Allen PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Constitutional Question by plaintiff Demetria Booker (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 04/02 9:01 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (mg)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Wed 04/02 9:07 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Van Buren, County of (none provided) (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 03/31 2:31 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Demetria Booker in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7657412 (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Van Buren County Treasurer against Demetria Booker filed by Demetria Booker (Ryan, Ronald)
Related: [-]