Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00247
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury/ Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
ELCO Administrative Service Company
Defendant
Ean Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC
Defendant
Emani Reeves
Plaintiff
John Xavier George Anaya
P.O. Box 203
Petersburg, VA 23803
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Enterprise Mobility Inc
Terminated: 04/28/2025


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:04 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. On April 28, 2025, the pro se plaintiff filed an amended complaint, which clarifies that this action arises out of an accident that occurred in Crystal City, Virginia, which is located in Arlington County, Virginia. A district court may "transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought." 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Venue is proper in a judicial district in which a "substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred." Id. § 1391(b)(2). Under Local Civil Rule 3(C), § 1391 also applies when determining the proper division in which a plaintiff may file an action. Here, a "substantial part of the events... giving rise to the claim" occurred in Arlington County. 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b)(2). The Alexandria Division covers cases that arise in Arlington County. E.D. Va. Loc. Civ. R. 3(B)(1). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this case to the Alexandria Division. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 4/29/2025. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff.)(ewat, )
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 04/29 4:50 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to Alexandria, case opened 1:25cv728 (jlan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/29 8:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Enterprise RAC Company of Maryland, LLC, Emani Reeves, Ean Holdings, LLC, ELCO Administrative Service Company, filed by John Xavier George Anaya.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 83.1
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Enterprise Mobility Inc, filed by John Xavier George Anaya.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unmarked Attachments,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Local Rule 83.1,
Att: 4 Service Addresses
2 2 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/07 1:35 PM
ORDER - the Court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint. To assist the Court with its initial review of the plaintiff's allegations and in the interest of judicial efficiency, the Court DIRECTS the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. It is SO ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 4/7/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (ewat, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/28 5:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Xavier George Anaya.(ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint (Received),
Att: 2 Unmarked Attachments,
Att: 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Local Rule 83.1