California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:25-cv-02737
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Adam R. Block
Defendant
Jeffrey R. Cerciello
Represented By
Benjamin Gregory Kassis
Frost, LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Dicker
Frost LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farmshop Commissary, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Gregory Kassis
Frost, LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Dicker
Frost LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farmshop DTLA, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Gregory Kassis
Frost, LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Dicker
Frost LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farmshop Hospitality, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Gregory Kassis
Frost, LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Dicker
Frost LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farmshop, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Gregory Kassis
Frost, LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Dicker
Frost LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Green Farms California, LLC
Represented By
Omar H. Bengali
Girard Bengali Apc
contact info
Steven Mark Buha
Girard Bengali Apc
contact info
Robert J Girard, II
Girard Bengali Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 05/12 11:08 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/08 5:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Cerciello, Farmshop Commissary, LLC, Farmshop DTLA, LLC, Farmshop Hospitality, LLC, Farmshop, LLC.(Kassis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/23 6:32 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey R. Cerciello answer now due 5/8/2025; Farmshop, LLC answer now due 5/8/2025; Farmshop Hospitality, LLC answer now due 5/8/2025; Farmshop DTLA, LLC answer now due 5/8/2025; Farmshop Commissary, LLC answer now due 5/8/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Cerciello; Farmshop, LLC; Farmshop Hospitality, LLC; Farmshop DTLA, LLC; Farmshop Commissary, LLC.(Kassis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Wed 04/23 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey R. Cerciello, Farmshop Commissary, LLC, Farmshop DTLA, LLC, Farmshop Hospitality, LLC, Farmshop, LLC (Kassis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Wed 04/23 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis on behalf of Defendants Jeffrey R. Cerciello, Farmshop Commissary, LLC, Farmshop DTLA, LLC, Farmshop Hospitality, LLC, Farmshop, LLC (Attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis added to party Jeffrey R. Cerciello(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis added to party Farmshop Commissary, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis added to party Farmshop DTLA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis added to party Farmshop Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Kassis added to party Farmshop, LLC(pty:dft))(Kassis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/02 10:32 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/31 5:05 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Adam R. Block, Jeffrey R. Cerciello, Farmshop Commissary, LLC, Farmshop DTLA, LLC, Farmshop Hospitality, LLC, Farmshop, LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Jeffrey R. Cerciello,
Att: 2 Farmshop Commissary, LLC,
Att: 3 Farmshop, LLC,
Att: 4 Farmshop DTLA, LLC,
Att: 5 Farmshop Hospitality, LLC
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/31 5:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/31 5:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/31 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/28 2:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Green Farms California, LLC DBA Worldwide Produce identifying Worldwide Produce Topco, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bengali, Omar)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 2:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Green Farms California, LLC DBA Worldwide Produce.(Bengali, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Cerciello,
Att: 2 Summons - Farmshop Commissary,
Att: 3 Summons - Farmshop DTLA,
Att: 4 Summons - Farmshop Hospitality,
Att: 5 Summons - Farmshop LLC
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/28 1:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Green Farms California, LLC DBA Worldwide Produce. (Bengali, Omar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/28 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 03/28/2025, receipt number ACACDC-39400542), filed by Plaintiff Green Farms California, LLC DBA Worldwide Produce. (Attorney Omar H. Bengali added to party Green Farms California, LLC DBA Worldwide Produce(pty:pla))(Bengali, Omar)
Related: [-]