California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-02741
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc.
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ramiro Ornelas
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Century Surety Company
Represented By
Wendi J. Frisch
Clark Hill LLP
contact info
Pamela Annette Palmer
Clark Hill PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/29 6:14 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ramiro Ornelas answer now due 5/29/2025; Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc. answer now due 5/29/2025, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 filed by Defendants Ramiro Ornelas; Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc..(Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party Ramiro Ornelas(pty:dft), Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc.(pty:dft))(Soto, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/16 5:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, upon Defendant Ramiro Ornelas served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Ramiro Ornelas in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Frisch, Wendi)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/16 5:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, upon Defendant Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc. served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Ornelas Wood Recovery Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Frisch, Wendi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/02 9:20 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Ramiro Ornelas and Ornelas Wood Recovery, Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ROrnelas
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/02 8:34 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:20 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/28 3:16 PM
PLAINTIFF CENTURY SURETY COMPANYS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation, identifying Century Surety Company, Star Insurance Company, Ameritrust Group, Inc., Miracle Nova II LLC, Miracle Nova I LLC, Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, Accident Fund Holdings, Inc., Emergent Holdings, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Palmer, Pamela)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 3:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation. (Palmer, Pamela)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 3:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation. (Palmer, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/28 2:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation. (Palmer, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/28 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39401021 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation. (Attorney Pamela Annette Palmer added to party Century Surety Company, an Ohio Corporation(pty:pla))(Palmer, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H