Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 3:25-cv-00103
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 28, 2025 5:12 PM CDT
Defendant
Stacey Robinson
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
John E. Gough, Jr
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Oxford
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 order Judgment - Consent Mon 04/28 3:09 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Stacey Robinson. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 4/28/2025. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/25 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John E. Gough, Jr on behalf of United States of America Stacey Robinson served on 4/24/2025. (Gough, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/28 2:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Stacey Robinson. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Fri 03/28 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
Related: [-]