Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Shirley Padmore Mensah
Case #: 4:25-cv-00406
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2617 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Commerce Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By
Megan D. Meadows
Spencer Fane Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Catherine L Schwarze
Spencer Fane Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia Eason
Represented By
Alan Grady Crone
The Crone Law Firm Plc - Memphis
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 05/13 11:53 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commerce Bancshares, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Schwarze, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 order Rule 16 Order Mon 05/12 2:58 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track 2: (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/28/2025. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/28/2025. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 5/12/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Wed 04/30 12:10 PM
Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Commerce Bancshares, Inc., Plaintiff Marcia Eason to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/7/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 04/29 2:01 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Commerce Bancshares, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CLH)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 12:43 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/29/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 04/28 4:24 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L Schwarze for Defendant Commerce Bancshares, Inc.. (Schwarze, Catherine)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 4:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Defendant Commerce Bancshares, Inc.. (Meadows, Megan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 04/28 4:15 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Megan D. Meadows for Defendant Commerce Bancshares, Inc.. (Meadows, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 service Notice of Process Server Wed 04/09 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marcia Eason Process Server: D&B Legal Services (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Wed 04/02 10:40 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Marcia Eason to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/23/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 order Clerk's Reassignment Order (NON-CJRA) Tue 04/01 10:51 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER (NMG). Sr. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah for all further proceedings. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 03/31 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marcia Eason Process Server: Missouri Process Serving (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 03/31 3:57 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Alan Crone. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Commerce Bancshares,Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-11169144, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Marcia Eason.(Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Commerce Bancshares Inc.,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form-no case previously filed