Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:25-cv-00320
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Frontier Communications of America, Inc.
Plaintiff
Anadex Data Communications LLC
Represented By
Trevor James Beaty
Shea Beaty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Frontier Communications of America, Inc.. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 03/28 7:34 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Anadex Data Communications LLC (Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 03/28 7:32 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Frontier Communications of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10754369.), filed by Anadex Data Communications LLC.(Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/31 9:49 AM
Case assigned to Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 03/31 9:49 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]