California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-02757
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
BackGrid USA, Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Ardalan
One LLP
contact info
Defendant
Backgrid Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Ardalan
One LLP
contact info
Defendant
FameFlynet Inc.
Defendant
Flynet Pictures, LLC
Defendant
Shutterstock, Inc.
Represented By
Joanna Ardalan
One LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michel Boutefeu
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Duplaquet
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephane Kyndt
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thibault Mauvilain
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Henri Mazari
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Mehdi
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Christian Wolf
Represented By
David A. Sergenian
Sergenian Law Apc
contact info
Shengmao Mu
Whitewood Law
contact info
Abby M Neu
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Keaton D Smith
Whitewood Law PC
contact info
Ryan E Carreon
Whitewood Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Getty Images Holdings, Inc.
Terminated: 04/10/2025
Defendant
Getty Images US, Inc.
Terminated: 04/10/2025


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 05/07 2:55 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Backgrid Inc. answer now due 6/9/2025; BackGrid USA, Inc. answer now due 6/9/2025; Shutterstock, Inc. answer now due 6/9/2025, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,21 filed by Defendants Backgrid Inc.; BackGrid USA, Inc.; Shutterstock, Inc..(Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party BackGrid USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party Backgrid Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party Shutterstock, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ardalan, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
32 32 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/29 12:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, upon Defendant Backgrid Inc. served on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Boris Nizon in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/28 1:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, upon Defendant Flynet Pictures, LLC served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Scott Cosman in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/28 1:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, upon Defendant FameFlynet Inc. served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Scott Cosman in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/23 1:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Carreon counsel for Plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Jeremy Duplaquet, Robert Christian Wolf, Michel Boutefeu, Stephane Kyndt, and Joseph Mehdi.. (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Michel Boutefeu(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Jeremy Duplaquet(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Thibault Mauvilain(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Henri Mazari(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Joseph Mehdi(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Robert Christian Wolf(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/23 12:54 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shengmao Mu counsel for Plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf. Adding Shengmao Mu as counsel of record for Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Jeremy Duplaquet, Robert Christian Wolf, Michel Boutefeu, Stephane Kyndt, and Joseph Mehdi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Jeremy Duplaquet, Robert Christian Wolf, Michel Boutefeu, Stephane Kyndt, and Joseph Mehdi. (Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Michel Boutefeu(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Jeremy Duplaquet(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Stephane Kyndt(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Thibault Mauvilain(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Henri Mazari(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Joseph Mehdi(pty:pla), Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Robert Christian Wolf(pty:pla))(Mu, Shengmao)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
27 27 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 11:32 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Keaton D. Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf, designating David A. Sergenian as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 11:28 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: granting22 Non-Resident Attorney Abby M. Neu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf, designating David A. Sergenian as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/21 12:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, upon Defendant Shutterstock, Inc. served on 4/18/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Rebecca Vang in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 04/21 12:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, upon Defendant BackGrid USA, Inc. served on 4/18/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Rebecca Vang in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 04/18 2:02 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Keaton D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39536941) filed by Plaintiff Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 04/18 1:58 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Abby M. Neu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39536877) filed by Plaintiff Michel Boutefeu, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt, Thibault Mauvilain, Henri Mazari, Joseph Mehdi, Robert Christian Wolf. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 04/10 1:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Christian Wolf, Henri Mazari, Michel Boutefeu, Joseph Mehdi, Thibault Mauvilain, Jeremy Duplaquet, Stephane Kyndt(Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Michel Boutefeu(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Jeremy Duplaquet(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Stephane Kyndt(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Henri Mazari(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Joseph Mehdi(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Robert Christian Wolf(pty:pla))(Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
20 20 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/02 9:59 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (evc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 11:24 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Shutterstock, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 11:23 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Getty Images US, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 11:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Getty Images Holdings, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 11:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Flynet Pictures, LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 10:51 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant FameFlynet Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 10:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Backgrid Inc. (sh)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/01 10:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant BackGrid USA, Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:45 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:45 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 6:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Fri 03/28 5:44 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Thibault Mauvilain. (Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 90 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/28 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39403417 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Thibault Mauvilain. (Attorney David A. Sergenian added to party Thibault Mauvilain(pty:pla))(Sergenian, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet