New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:25-cv-02499
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 1:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Jeanine Ashman, Jason Ayala, Cadet, Pasko Delovic, Ezekwea, K-9 Officer, Marlyn Kopp, Stephen Marsar, Charles Mitchell, New York State, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Danzel Palmer, Mario Panzarella, Trapani with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr. Related document:1 Complaint..(ar)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter Fri 04/25 1:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Alexander Williams Jr dated 4/18/2025 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr. (ar)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Processed Tue 04/22 3:49 PM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed letter to Alexander Williams 23-B-3963 at Sing Sing C.F., 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562 advising that copy/copies of the complaint requested will be furnished upon receipt of the statutory fee of $50.00 in the form of a company check, certified check or money order payable to the Clerk of the Court, SDNY. (sov)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 misc Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet - Received Tue 04/22 3:30 PM
Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re7 Letter. Request for copy of complaint from Alexander Williams, Jr. received on 4/21/2025. Transmission to Records Management for processing. (ar)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Tue 04/22 1:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Alexander Williams dated 4/16/2025 re: Response to Court correspondence of April 7, 2025. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr.(ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Wed 04/09 2:48 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Alexander Williams Jr. DIN:23B3963 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562-5442. (anc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/08 4:16 PM
ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiff to show cause, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this Court should not transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Plaintiff may comply with this order by completing, signing, and submitting the attached declaration form within the time allowed. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the Court may transfer this action, in whole or, after severing claims, in part, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/7/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, April 04, 2025
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Fri 04/04 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (caf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 04/03 2:43 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Alexander Williams Jr. DIN:23B3963 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562-5442 and the Superintendent of the Sing Sing Correctional Facility. (ne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case Wed 04/02 4:36 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments.... Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of the Plaintiff.... The Clerk of the Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/2025) (sac)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 03/28 1:14 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Alexander Williams Jr. DIN:23B3963 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562-5442. (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Thu 03/27 12:38 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (caf)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Thu 03/27 12:39 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (caf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 misc Prisoner Authorization Thu 03/27 12:35 PM
PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr.(caf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/27 12:35 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr.(caf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/27 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Jeanine Ashman, Jason Ayala, Cadet, Lyle Carrington, Pasko Delovic, Ezekwea, Kathy Hochul, Kabore, Kara, Marlyn Kopp, Anne Marie, Stephen Marsar, Daniel F. Martuscello, Charles Mitchell, New York State, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Danzel Palmer, Mario Panzarella, Trapani. Document filed by Alexander Williams, Jr..(caf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Complaint Part 2
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 03/27 12:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (caf)
Related: [-]