New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:25-cv-02600
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause15:294 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Alex Konanykhin
Defendant
Unicoin, Inc.
228 Park Avenue South 16065
New York, NY 10003
Plaintiff
Christopher DiFonzo
Represented By
Alexander Granovsky
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 04/17 10:21 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint,. Unicoin, Inc. served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Christopher DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons - Served,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Compplaint - Served,
Att: 3 Exhibit Original Complaint - Served,
Att: 4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet - Served,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Initital Pretrial Conference - Served
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/03 3:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending5 Complaint against Alex Konanykhin, Unicoin, Inc..Document filed by Christopher DiFonzo. Related document:5 Complaint..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Redline Showing Changes to Original Complaint
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 4:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Konanykhin..(gp)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 4:24 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unicoin, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/01 2:20 PM
ORDER, No later than April 8, 2025, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of each party to this action. If, by that date, Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint establishing this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice and without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2025.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/1/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 04/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 2, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Courts dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681 and using access code 2303 019 3884, followed by the pound (#) key. When prompted for an attendee ID number, press the pound (#) key again. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/2/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/1/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 2:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEX KONANYKHIN, re:5 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 2:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNICOIN, INC., re:5 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Alex Konanykhin, Unicoin, Inc.. Document filed by Christopher DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 03/31 11:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexander Granovsky to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 11:58 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Granovsky to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Nature of Suit code was not selected; multiple Citizenship Defendant codes was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/31 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Granovsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $224,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/31 12:00 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Granovsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher PLLC DiFonzo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/31 12:01 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/31 12:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/31 12:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 12:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Granovsky to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Plaintiff/Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 03/30 12:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEX KONANYKHIN, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher PLLC DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 03/30 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNICOIN, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher PLLC DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/28 6:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 6:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30846731)Document filed by Christopher PLLC DiFonzo..(Granovsky, Alexander)
Related: [-]