Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00341
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause28:1352 Miller Act
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Great American Insurance Company
Represented By
Brett Devereux Divers
Paskert Divers Thompson
contact info
Counter Claimant
Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.
Represented By
John Madison Davis Fox
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
John A. Tucker
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
The United States of America
Represented By
Edward J. Kinberg
Stewart Law Cs, LLC
contact info
Blake Bernard Stewart
Stewart Law Cs, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.
Represented By
John Madison Davis Fox
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
John A. Tucker
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Terrance M. White
Represented By
Terrence M. White
Upchurch, Watson, White & Max
contact info
Plaintiff
The United States of America
Represented By
Edward J. Kinberg
Stewart Law Cs, LLC
contact info
Blake Bernard Stewart
Stewart Law Cs, LLC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Belen Valda
101 E. Arlington Street
Satellite Beach, FL 32937
Third Party Defendant
Geraldo Valda
101 E. Arlington Street
Satellite Beach, FL 32937
Third Party Plaintiff
Great American Insurance Company
Represented By
Brett Devereux Divers
Paskert Divers Thompson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Great American Insurance Company
Terminated: 06/21/2024
Represented By
Brett Devereux Divers
Paskert Divers Thompson
contact info
Third Party Defendant
David C Spatta
Terminated: 06/21/2024
17905 Gourd Neck Loop
Winter Garden, FL 34787
Third Party Defendant
Heather Spatta
Terminated: 06/21/2024
17905 Gourd Neck Loop
Winter Garden, FL 34787


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
59 59 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Tue 05/06 10:33 AM
Order granting doc. 56 Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and denying as moot docs. 24 , 25 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant The United States of America's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/6/2025. (BJR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
58 58 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 1:11 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2025. Discovery due by 1/9/2026. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/14/2026. Dispositive motions due by 1/30/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2026 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/6/2026 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/2/2025.(JW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Court Docket
Thursday, May 01, 2025
57 57 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/01 5:57 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting docs. 52 , 53 Stipulated Motions for Withdrawal of Counsel of Record for Plaintiff. The clerk is directed to remove Edward J. Kinberg, Esq. and Blake B. Stewart, Esq., as counsel of record in the matter. Plaintiff continues to be represented by other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/1/2025. (BJR)
Related: [-]
56 56 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 05/01 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend15 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim (to amend Affirmative Defenses) by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co.(a Michigan corporation). (Tucker, John)
Related: [-]
55 55 cmp Counterclaim Thu 05/01 4:17 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against The United States of America(f/u/b Intergrated Construction Managment, Inc., a Florida corporation) filed by Wolverine Fire Protection, Co..(Tucker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subcontract,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Composite) Wolverine's Deductive Change Orders,
Att: 3 Exhibit Modification
54 54 misc Case Management Report Thu 05/01 1:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tucker, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
53 53 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/30 10:53 AM
MOTION for Blake Stewart to Withdraw as Attorney for The United States of America. (Stewart, Blake) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified on 4/30/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]
52 52 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/30 10:52 AM
MOTION for Edward J. Kinberg, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney for The United States of America. (Stewart, Blake) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified on 4/30/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]