Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:25-cv-00736
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Louis Alessi
Represented By
David Matthew DePasquale
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amazing 7 Studios LLC
Represented By
David Matthew DePasquale
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Plaxonic Technologies Inc.
Represented By
David Matthew DePasquale
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nigel Lucombe
P.O. Box 2589
Lutz, FL 33548


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/30 8:53 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Louis Alessi, Amazing 7 Studios LLC, and Plaxonic Technologies Inc.'s answer or response due 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/30/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 04/29 5:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Louis Alessi, Amazing 7 Studios LLC, Plaxonic Technologies Inc.. (DePasquale, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Fri 04/25 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation and Appearance by David Matthew DePasquale on behalf of Louis Alessi, Amazing 7 Studios LLC, Plaxonic Technologies Inc. (DePasquale, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/04 9:57 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion to File Electronically As A Pro Se Party. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/4/2025. (KBP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Tue 04/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 03/28 5:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Louis Alessi, Amazing 7 Studios LLC, Plaxonic Technologies Inc. (KME)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/28 5:10 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to File Electronically As A Pro Se Party by Nigel Lucombe. (KME)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/28 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Louis Alessi, Amazing 7 Studios LLC, Plaxonic Technologies Inc. with Jury Demand. Filing fee $405.00, receipt number TPA-71985 filed by Nigel Lucombe.(KME)
Related: [-]