Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:25-mc-00471
CauseMotion to Quash
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sasha G. Rao for Phison Technology, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 5:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Phison Technology Inc., re1 Opposed MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order from Plaintiff Vervain, LLC's Deposition and Document Subpoena filed by Movant Phison Technology Inc. (Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 11:31 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Chiaviello , for Sasha G. Rao ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20065344) by on behalf of Phison Technology Inc.. (Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 2:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Vervain, LLC, re1 Opposed MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order from Plaintiff Vervain, LLC's Deposition and Document Subpoena filed by Movant Phison Technology Inc.(Whitehurst, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher McNett,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 misc Payment of Miscellaneous Filing Fee Mon 03/31 11:55 AM
Miscellaneous Filing fee received in the amount of $52, receipt number ATXWDC-19979631. (Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 motion Quash Fri 03/28 8:26 PM
Opposed MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order from Plaintiff Vervain, LLC's Deposition and Document Subpoena by Phison Technology Inc..(Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of S. Rao in support of Motion to Quash,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/31 3:19 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 03/31 3:19 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]