Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00065
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 1:12 AM MDT
Defendant
Nicole Peloquin (1)
Represented By
Kilie A. Latendresse
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bryan David Fields
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 2:28 AM MDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 RULE 5 AFFIDAVIT as to Nicole Peloquin from the District of Southern District of Florida. as to Nicole Peloquin (1). (angar, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document
2 2 Arrest of Nicole Peloquin - Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 3/27/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Text Only entry) (angar, )
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings and Identity Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella as to Nicole Peloquin on 3/27/2025. Defendant present in custody. Defendant waives advisement. Court appoints counsel. Defendant waives right to an Identity Hearing. Waiver accepted by the Court. Advisement pursuant to Brady v. Maryland. Detention Hearing set for 4/1/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Defendant remanded. Hearing concluded. FTR: C204. (Total time: 2:47 - 2:52, Hearing time: 5 minutes) APPEARANCES: Martha Paluch on behalf of the Government, Kilie Latendresse on behalf of the defendant, Carlos Morales on behalf of pretrial. Text Only Entry. (schap, )
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nicole Peloquin. (schap, )
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Nicole Peloquin (schap, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Nicole Peloquin by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3/25/2025. Text Only Entry (schap, )
Related: [-]