New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00551
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 1:38 AM MDT
Defendant
Hector Alberto Mandujano-Herrera (1)
Represented By
Victoria Trull
Federal Public Defender'S Office Las Cruces
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Brenda Richardson
U.S. Probation/pretrial
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jackson Kemper Dering
Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 3:32 AM MDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Arrest of Hector Alberto Mandujano-Herrera (cfa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
Hearing as to Hector Alberto Mandujano-Herrera: Initial Appearance set for 3/28/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (cfa)
Related: [-]