Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00196
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Carlos Zamudio-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Jesus Ricardo Canales
Law Offices Of Rick Canales
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Maria Elena Llanos-Salinas
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 3:42 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 3/19/2025 as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by U.S. Probation Office. Attorney Ricardo Canales made announcement he has been retained and has filed a Notice of Appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 3/24/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. Defendant held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 3/24/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Zachary Blackmon, AUSA; Rick Canales f/det, Rtd.; (USPO: D Oritz)(ERO: J Longoria) (Interpreter: M Hanson) (DUSM: D Figueroa) (CSO: T Arriaga) (als1) (9:34-10:02AM) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Maria Elena Llanos-Salinas appearing for USA, filed. (Llanos-Salinas, Maria) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez (1), filed. (Cameron) (jrl1) (dar1). (dar1). [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/19/2025) Unredacted attachment
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez arrested on 3/18/2025, filed. (jrl1) (dar1). (dar1). [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/19/2025) Unredacted attachment
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jesus Ricardo Canales appearing for Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez, filed. (jmt1) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez, filed. [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: DETENTION HEARING as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez held on 3/24/2025. After review of the PSA report and arguments of counsel, the Court finds there is no condition or combination of conditions that would reasonably assure the defendant's appearance at further court proceedings or safeguard the community and orders defendant held without bond pending further proceedings. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Elena Salinas, AUSA; Rick Canales f/deft;(USPO: E Castillo)(ERO: B Vasquez) (Interpreter: J Ortiz) (DUSM: R Ramirez) (CSO: T Arriaga) (als1) (11:25-11:36AM) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez, filed. (ec1) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING Trial as to Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (dlr1) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Jose Carlos Zamudio Rodriguez, filed. (mp1) [1:25-mj-00221]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 3 pgs INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Carlos Zamudio-Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
10 10 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Carlos Zamudio-Rodriguez, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jose Carlos Zamudio-Rodriguez. Arraignment set for 4/10/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]