Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00204
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Arturo Rangel-Cruz (1)
Represented By
Arturo Vasquez
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul Marius Marian
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 3:44 AM CDT
Sunday, March 23, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz (1), filed. (Cameron) (bav1) (mp1). [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz arrested on 3/22/2025, filed. (bav1) (mp1). [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 3/24/2025 as to Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. The defendant testifies to the Court that he cannot afford to hire his own counsel, and the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appoint of counsel. The Court appoints counsel to represent the defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 04/02/2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. DETENTION HEARING held. Bond set at $25,000 Cash Deposit with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community, as ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Victoria Aranda, AUSA; Humberto Yzaguirre f/deft, AFPD; (USPO: E Castillo) (ERO: B Vasquez) (Interpreter: J Ortiz) (DUSM: R Ramirez) (CSO: T Arriaga) (als1) (9:31-9:52AM) [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1) [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz, filed. (Vasquez, Arturo) [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz, filed. [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Juan Arturo Rangel Cruz, filed. (ec1) [1:25-mj-00223]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Juan Arturo Rangel-Cruz (1) count(s) 1, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Juan Arturo Rangel-Cruz, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Juan Arturo Rangel-Cruz. Arraignment set for 4/10/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III, filed. (bav1)
Related: [-]