Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00474
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais (1)
Represented By
Alfonso Cabanas, Jr.
Cabanas Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anne Marie Cordova
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/30/2025 3:37 AM CDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
Arrest of Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais (rqr)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer as to Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais. (rqr)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais. (rqr)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Initial Appearance as to Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais held on 3/27/2025. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Alfonso Cabanas, Jr for Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais appointed. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Irvin Jovanny Gutierrez-Monsivais. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 4/1/2025 10:30 AM before Judge U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr)
Related: [-]