District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Carl J Nichols
Case #: 1:25-cv-00933
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR.
Plaintiff
W O MOSS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH HARRIS METHODIST FORT WORTH
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH HARRIS METHODIST HOSPITAL CLEBURNE
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH HARRIS METHODIST HOSPITAL STEPHENVILLE
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH HARRIS METHODIST HURST-EULESS-BEDFORD
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL ALLEN
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL KAUFMAN
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UH BEDFORD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UH CLEVELAND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UH REGIONAL HOSPITALS
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL & CLINICS
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TEXAS HEALTH ARLINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIS KNIGHTON BOSSIER HEALTH CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
E A CONWAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HUEY P. LONG MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LSU HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER - SHREVEPORT
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MEDICAL CENTER OF LOUISIANA AT NEW ORLEANS
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ST. VINCENT CHARITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIS KNIGHTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES AND VIRGINA HICKMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CLEVELAND CLINIC
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
D C H REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EARL K. LONG MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EUCLID HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL DALLAS
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FLOWER HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAKEWOOD HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LSU HEALTH BOGALUSA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LUTHERAN HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MERCY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OUR LADY OF LOURDES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OUR LADY OF THE LAKE ASCENSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL - ST ELIZABETH HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OUR LADY OF THE LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL ROCKVILLE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SOUTH POINTE HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ST DOMINIC-JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By
Alan Jay Sedley
Nelson Hardiman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 04/22 2:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2025.(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 04/22 2:09 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR served on 4/7/2025(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 04/22 2:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/08/2025.(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 order Standing Order Thu 04/03 11:45 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 4/3/25. (lccjn1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 04/02 8:49 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/02 8:47 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 misc Errata Tue 04/01 6:33 PM
ERRATA by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER. (Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 04/01 6:32 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 6:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR filed by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER.(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 04/01 3:35 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 3:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR filed by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER.(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons 1,
Att: 2 Summons 2,
Att: 3 Summons 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Errata
Monday, March 31, 2025
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 03/31 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 03/30 9:39 PM
COMPLAINT against ROBERT F. KENNEDY AS SECRETARY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11576989) filed by FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER.(Sedley, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A1-41,
Att: 2 Exhibit B