California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:25-cv-02766
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0001 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 2:10 AM PDT
Petitioner
X Corp.
Represented By
Max C Fischer
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul D Clement
Clement And Murphy, PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Keshava Pallaki
Clement And Murphy, PLLC
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes, IV
Clement And Murphy PLLC
contact info
Eric Meckley
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Respondent
Kyle Bahr
Respondent
Kevyn Bele-Binda
Respondent
Yomna Elsayed
Respondent
Shazia Haq
Respondent
Farah Mynaf
Respondent
Frank Rodriguez
Respondent
Oleg Trofimov


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Fri 05/16 11:22 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR X CORP.'S MOTION24 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: 1. Respondents Kyle Bahr, Kevyn Bele-Binda, Yomna Elsayed, Shazia Haq, Farah Mynaf, Frank Rodriguez, and Oleg Trofimov shall have until May 30, 2025, to file any response to Petitioner X. Corp.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration. 2. Petitioner X Corp. shall have until June 20, 2025, to file any reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration. 3. X Corp.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration shall be scheduled for hearing on July 28, 2025, at 9:00 AM22 . (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 stip Reschedule Fri 05/16 8:45 AM
STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Petitioner X Corp..(Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 01, 2025
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 05/01 12:54 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner re: The hearing on the Amended MOTION to Compel Arbitration22 is CONTINUED to 7/14/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Briefing on the motion shall reset accordingly. The originally filed motion at21 having been superseded by the amended motion22 is hereby stricken. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Compel Arbitration Thu 05/01 7:11 AM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Petitioner X Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Adam Mehes Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - June 2, 2023, Letter to JAMS,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Eisner Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - June 28, 2023, Letter to JAMS,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - JAMS February 25, 2025, Filing Fee Invoice,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
21 21 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 04/30 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Petitioner X Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Adam Mehes Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - June 2, 2023, Letter to JAMS,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Eisner Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - June 28, 2023, Letter to JAMS,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - JAMS February 25, 2025, Filing Fee Invoice,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/23 11:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner X Corp.. upon Kyle Bahr waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Kevyn Bele-Binda waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Yomna Elsayed waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Shazia Haq waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Farah Mynaf waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Frank Rodriguez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025; Oleg Trofimov waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Shannon Liss-Riordan. (Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Mon 04/21 3:35 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents)16 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Stricken for the reasons indicated on the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies17 . Counsel shall refile a proper Proof of Service using the correct event. (mal)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 04/21 11:45 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Meckley counsel for Petitioner X Corp.. Adding Eric Meckley as counsel of record for X Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Attorney Eric Meckley added to party X Corp.(pty:pet))(Meckley, Eric)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 04/21 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). pdf is proof of summons issued. Due to incorrect event, docket information is incomplete as to who, how and when service of process was made. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/18 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner X Corp., of Petition to Compel Arbitration, Civil Cover Sheet, Court Notices, Notice of Interested Parties and Summons served on April 17, 2024. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/04 11:46 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kyle Bahr, Kevyn Bele-Binda, Yomna Elsayed, Shazia Haq, Farah Mynaf, Frank Rodriguez, Oleg Trofimov. (sh)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/04 11:04 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner X Corp., identifying X HOLDINGS CORP. and X.AI HOLDINGS CORP.. (Clement, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 4:21 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting6 Non-Resident Attorney Paul D. Clement APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of petitioner X Corp., designating Max Fischer as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 4:17 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting5 Non-Resident Attorney Mitchell K. Pallaki APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner X Corp., designating Max Fischer as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 4:12 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting4 Non-Resident Attorney C. Harker Rhodes IV APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner X Corp, designating Max Fischer as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/01 1:52 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/01 11:08 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/01 11:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/01 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/31 3:51 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner X Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39412383) filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/31 3:44 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mitchell K. Pallaki to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner X Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39412243) filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/31 3:38 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney C. Harker Rhodes IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner X Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39412068) filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/28 8:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/28 8:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/28 8:32 PM
PETITION to Compel Arbitration Receipt No: ACACDC-39404430 - Fee: $405, filed by Petitioner X Corp.. (Attorney Max C Fischer added to party X Corp.(pty:pet))(Fischer, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to 3