Original Case: 1:25-cv-10676

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01311
Typecivil / us a party civil case / other statutes
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:48 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Mark Sauter
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Daniel Cappelletti
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Abraham R. George
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Matthew Patrick Seamon
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Donald Campbell Lockhart
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Elianis N. Perez
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Mary Larakers
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Aysha Iqbal
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Yaakov Roth
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KRISTI NOEM, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By
Mark Sauter
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Daniel Cappelletti
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Abraham R. George
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Matthew Patrick Seamon
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Donald Campbell Lockhart
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Elianis N. Perez
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Mary Larakers
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Aysha Iqbal
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Yaakov Roth
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PAMELA J. BONDI, United States Attorney General
Represented By
Mark Sauter
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Daniel Cappelletti
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Abraham R. George
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Matthew Patrick Seamon
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Donald Campbell Lockhart
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Elianis N. Perez
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Mary Larakers
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Aysha Iqbal
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Yaakov Roth
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ANTONE MONIZ, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility
Represented By
Mark Sauter
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Daniel Cappelletti
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Abraham R. George
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Matthew Patrick Seamon
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Donald Campbell Lockhart
US Attorney's Office
contact info
Elianis N. Perez
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Mary Larakers
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Aysha Iqbal
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Yaakov Roth
US Dept of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
D.V.D.
Represented By
Anwen Hughes
Human Rights First
contact info
Leila Kang
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Tomas Arango
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Kristin Macleod-Ball
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Aaron Korthuis
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Trina A. Realmuto
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Matt Adams
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Glenda M. Aldana Madrid
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Mary A. Kenney
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
M.M.
Represented By
Anwen Hughes
Human Rights First
contact info
Leila Kang
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Tomas Arango
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Kristin Macleod-Ball
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Aaron Korthuis
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Trina A. Realmuto
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Matt Adams
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Glenda M. Aldana Madrid
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Mary A. Kenney
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
E.F.D.
Represented By
Anwen Hughes
Human Rights First
contact info
Leila Kang
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Tomas Arango
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Kristin Macleod-Ball
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Aaron Korthuis
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Trina A. Realmuto
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Matt Adams
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Glenda M. Aldana Madrid
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Mary A. Kenney
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
O.C.G.
Represented By
Anwen Hughes
Human Rights First
contact info
Leila Kang
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Tomas Arango
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Kristin Macleod-Ball
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Aaron Korthuis
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Trina A. Realmuto
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info
Matt Adams
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Glenda M. Aldana Madrid
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
contact info
Mary A. Kenney
National Immigration Litigation Alliance
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 4:48 PM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #35) filed by Appellants Pamela J. Bondi, Antone Moniz, Kristi Noem and DHS. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/11/2025. 25-1311 (JW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF
1 pgs NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Pamela J. Bondi, DHS, Antone Moniz, Kristi Noem and Appellee D.V.D. filed by Attorney Mary Larakers. Served on 03/28/2025. 25-1311 (ML)
Related: [-]