Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:25-cv-00337
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 10:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Alvaro Leos, Sr.
Defendant
Lance McCook
Defendant
Latoya McCook
Plaintiff
Amerisure Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/12 8:47 PM
Defendants McCooks ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Marco Antonio Bass added to party Lance McCook(pty:dft), Attorney Marco Antonio Bass added to party Latoya McCook(pty:dft) by Lance McCook, Latoya McCook.(Bass, Marco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/01 4:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. Latoya McCook served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/01 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. Lance McCook served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/01 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. Alvaro Leos, Sr served on 4/21/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Alvaro Leos, Sr, Lance McCook, Latoya McCook. (bt)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 1:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. to Defendant Latoya McCook (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 1:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. to Defendant Lance McCook (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 1:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company. to Defendant Alvaro Leos, Sr. (Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 3:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (vl)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 6:02 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (r013)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19978468). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Amerisure Insurance Company, Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company.(Yoss, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 60 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 11:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 04/04 11:57 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rqr)
Related: [-]