Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Case #: 1:25-cv-21488
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 1:06 PM EDT
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Edwin LEMUS
Represented By
Mario Rene Urizar
Urizar Molina PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Odeth MONTERROSO BARCO
Represented By
Mario Rene Urizar
Urizar Molina PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 04/29 3:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 04/28 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Odeth MONTERROSO BARCO, Edwin LEMUS (Urizar, Mario)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned EXECUTED AS TO USA DFTS Tue 04/15 1:21 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Odeth MONTERROSO BARCO, Edwin LEMUS. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/7/2025, response/answer due 6/6/2025. U.S. Attorney General served on 4/7/2025, response/answer due 6/6/2025. U.S. Attorney served on 4/4/2025, response./answer due 6/3/2025 (Urizar, Mario) Modified Text on 4/15/2025 (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/02 8:44 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Odeth MONTERROSO BARCO, Edwin LEMUS (Urizar, Mario)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 04/01 11:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS. Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 04/01 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/1/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 03/31 3:00 PM
Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 03/31 2:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18326392, filed by Odeth MONTERROSO BARCO, Edwin LEMUS. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Urizar, Mario)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summon(s)