New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:25-cv-02634
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Team Industrial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
ITC Infotech (USA), Inc.


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/18 9:31 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. The conference is adjourned to June 26 at 2:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/17/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/17 4:10 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Christopher J. McNamara dated 04/17/2025. Document filed by Team Industrial Services, Inc...(McNamara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/18 9:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Team Industrial Services, Inc. answer due 5/21/2025., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 6/26/2025 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 6:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher James McNamara on behalf of Team Industrial Services, Inc...(McNamara, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 6:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Berg on behalf of Team Industrial Services, Inc...(Berg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Sat 04/12 12:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Team Industrial Services, Inc. served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. Document filed by ITC Infotech (USA), Inc...(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/09 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/6/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/8/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/01 8:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ITC Limited, Other Affiliate International Travel House Limited, Other Affiliate ITC Hotels Limited for ITC Infotech (USA), Inc.. Document filed by ITC Infotech (USA), Inc...(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 2:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Team Industrial Services, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/01 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Brian Anthony Burns to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (lb)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/01 1:13 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/01 1:14 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/01 1:14 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/31 4:54 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ITC Limited, Other Affiliate International Travel House Limited, Other Affiliate ITC Hotels Limited for ITC Infotech (USA), Inc.. Document filed by ITC Infotech (USA), Inc...(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 4:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 3:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Team Industrial Services, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by ITC Infotech (USA), Inc...(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Team Industrial Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30851577)Document filed by ITC Infotech (USA), Inc...(Burns, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Master Services Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Statement of Work (pages 1-10),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B Statement of Work (pages 11-20),
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B Statement of Work (pages 21-28),
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. B Statement of Work (pages 29-37),
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. C Amendment to Master Services Agreement