California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:25-cv-02772
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 12:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Loren K. Miller
Defendant
Kika Scott
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Ovi James
Represented By
Christina Sullivan Castro
Hacking Immigration Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Wed 04/16 10:02 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ovi James, upon Defendant Loren K. Miller served on 4/7/2025, answer due 6/6/2025; Kika Scott served on 4/7/2025, answer due 6/6/2025; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/7/2025, answer due 6/6/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Edward Tony. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS RECEIPTS
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/04 4:27 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/03 9:59 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Loren K. Miller, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/02 3:49 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/02 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/02 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/31 5:36 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ovi James, (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 03/31 5:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ovi James. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/31 5:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ovi James. (Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/31 5:29 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39405471 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ovi James. (Attorney Christina Sullivan Castro added to party Ovi James(pty:pla))(Castro, Christina)
Related: [-]