Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 2:25-cv-04056
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
APPLICANT CHECK LLC,
Plaintiff
JUSTIN ANTHONY WATSON
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/30 3:17 PM
ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. #7)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 4:43 PM
NOTICE of appearance by John G. Schultz on behalf of Applicant Check LLC (Attorney John G. Schultz added to party Applicant Check LLC(pty:dft))(Schultz, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 4:22 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Mark Joseph Galus on behalf of Applicant Check LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Galus, Mark)
Related: [-] 1
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 4:16 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Mark Joseph Galus on behalf of Applicant Check LLC (Attorney Mark Joseph Galus added to party Applicant Check LLC(pty:dft))(Galus, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 04/16 6:14 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Justin Anthony Watson. Applicant Check LLC served on 4/10/2025, answer due 5/1/2025. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 9:45 AM
ORDER granting3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Ryan D. Peterson for Justin Anthony Watson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 2:29 PM
Motion to allow Ryan D. Peterson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9534154) filed by Jenna Dakroub on behalf of Justin Anthony Watson.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Admissions List
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 7:03 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Applicant Check LLC. Provided to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
service Summons Reissued Tue 04/01 11:57 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED as to Applicant Check LLC. Provided to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of MAPNII Mon 03/31 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Lock, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against APPLICANT CHECK LLC, filed by Jenna Dakroub on behalf of JUSTIN ANTHONY WATSON. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9509079. Service due by 6/30/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet