Missouri Western District Court
Judge:David P Rush
Case #: 6:25-cv-03075
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Webster County, Missouri, 25WE-CC00016
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By
Nicholas S. Gerth
Watters Wolf Bub & Hansmann, LLC
contact info
Robert L. Brady
Watters, Wolf, Bub & Hansmann LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Doris Hunt, Individually and Doris Hunt, Trustee of the Hunt Revocable Living Trust Dated Dec 2, 2009
Plaintiff
Robert Hunt, Individually and Rober Hunt, as Successor Trustee of the Hunt Revocable Living Trust Dated Dec 2, 2009


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 05/05 9:36 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. In accordance with Local Rules 16.1 and 26.1, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 6/9/2025. Signed on 5/5/2025 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Tue 04/22 11:09 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/2/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Gerth, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Mon 03/31 2:31 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Nicholas S. Gerth on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Gerth, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of MAPNII Mon 03/31 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 1:39 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attorney Robert L. Brady added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Mon 03/31 1:30 PM
NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Gerth, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 1:28 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas S. Gerth on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Gerth, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/31 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Webster County, Missouri County, case number 25WE-CC00016, filed by Nicholas S. Gerth. Filing fee $405, receipt number BMOWDC-9508946.(Gerth, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 03/31 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 4/21/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]