New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:25-cv-02638
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Clarins U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff
Felipe Fernandez
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/09 8:02 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Clarins U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. Service was accepted by Minard Carkner. Document filed by Felipe Fernandez..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 6:49 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to discuss settlement and provide an update to the Court by July 7, 2025. Failure to notify the Court by that date may result in dismissal without prejudice. The time to answer is stayed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/4/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clarins U.S.A., Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/01 9:51 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/01 9:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/01 9:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 2:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CLARINS U.S.A., INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Felipe Fernandez..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/31 2:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Clarins U.S.A., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30852464)Document filed by Felipe Fernandez..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]