Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00571
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 6:49 AM EDT
Defendant
The School Board of Volusia County, Florida
Represented By
Sacha Dyson
Bush, Graziano, Rice & Platter, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anntonia Miro
Represented By
Jason L. Harr
The Harr Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/07 4:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must respond to the Amended Complaint by 5/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/7/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 05/06 11:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by The School Board of Volusia County, Florida. (Dyson, Sacha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 order Standing Order Wed 04/16 10:54 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 04/07 11:32 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anntonia Miro. Related case(s): No (Harr, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of lis pendens Thu 04/03 12:17 PM
NOTICE of lis pendens by Anntonia Miro (Harr, Jason). (NOTE: Counsel will re-file using the correct event) Modified on 4/3/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 12:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re8 Interested Persons Order by Anntonia Miro. (Harr, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Interested Persons Order Thu 04/03 11:47 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/3/2025. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/02 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason L. Harr on behalf of Anntonia Miro. Lead Counsel: Jason L. Harr. (Harr, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 6:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Anntonia Miro, as next of kin on behalf of A.A., a minor against The School Board of Volusia County, Florida with Jury Demand. filed by Anntonia Miro.(Harr, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Tue 04/01 4:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 1 Complaint and accompanying exhibits. The Complaint's [1-1] exhibit fails to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove the 1 Complaint and any accompanying exhibits from the docket. On or before April 3, 2025, Plaintiff shall refile its complaint, and any accompanying exhibits, in compliance with Rule 5.2. Additionally, any specific exhibits which reference personally identifiable information prohibited under Rule 5.2 shall be either redacted or filed under seal. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2025. (ND)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 04/01 11:55 AM
SUMMONS issued as to The School Board of Volusia County, Florida. (JK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/01 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/01 10:27 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:25-cv-571-PGB-DCI. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT Anntonia Miro, as next of kin on behalf of A.A., a minor against The School Board of Volusia County, Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23189873) filed by Anntonia Miro.(Harr, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Individual Education Plan,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons