North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 7:25-cv-00558
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 5:14 PM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Robert Radcliff
Represented By
Kevin Donovan
Rubenstein Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 04/09 4:55 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Miriam Agrait on behalf of Robert Radcliff. (Agrait, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 10:03 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Miriam Fresco Agrait must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/2/2025. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 04/01 4:27 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Robert Radcliff. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Receipt of Payment
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Tue 04/01 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:22 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Donovan on behalf of Robert Radcliff. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8047161.), filed by Robert Radcliff. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]