Colorado District Court
Judge:Richard T Gurley
Case #: 1:25-cv-01026
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 8 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 2:17 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order , an amended complaint on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. Plaintiff shall obtain the court- approved Prisoner Complaint form (with the assistance of his case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 4/30/2025. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 3:25 PM
AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Arapahoe County Detention Center, Arapahoe County Sheriff Office, and Arapahoe County Sheriff, filed by Jamarcus Dai'von Geiger-Smith.(agarc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
Filing fee RECEIVED: $ 405.00, receipt number 114041. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 12:58 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned (pro se) to Judge, Addressed to Jamarcus Dai'von Geiger-Smith. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 11:51 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCIES It is ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 4/1/2025. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 misc Case Assigned (PS) to Judge Mon 03/31 2:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley for Initial Review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1 (b). Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 2:25 PM
MOTION TO File Civil Lawsuit against Arapahoe County Detention Center, Arapahoe County Sheriff Office, filed by Jamarcus Dai'von Geiger-Smith.(echa, )
Related: [-]