Mauricio Lepe-Cholico v. Warden, FCI Lompoc
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02796 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
38 | 38
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 05/12 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/01/2025 re Transcript37 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cr) |
|
37 | 37
![]() TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/01/2025. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number 858-453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/2/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2025. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
![]() COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 5/1/2025 to 5/1/2025 filed by defendant Warden, FCI Lompoc. Court will contact Rebecca De Anda at rebecca.deanda@usdoj.gov with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion Hearing. Federal Government Agency - No fee required: United States Attorneys Office. (Kowal, David) |
|
35 | 35
![]() TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Warden, FCI Lompoc DCN number: R25CACA0711 for Court Smart (CS). (Kowal, David) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico for Court Smart (CS).(Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
33 | 33
![]() TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Warden, FCI Lompoc DCN number: R25CACA0707 for Court Reporter. (Kowal, David) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge David O. Carter 4 . Defendants are FURTHER ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why a preliminary injunction should not issue. The hearing on this Order to Show Cause is set before this Court on Friday, May 16, 2025. Petitioner must file any additional supporting papers by May 13, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. Defendant shall file any opposition papers by May 15, 2025, at 5:00 p.m. The TRO shall remain in effect until the Court rules on the preliminary injunction. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
31 | 31
![]() MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER4 . The Court GRANTS the MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER4 and sets an order to show cause hearing for May 16, 2025 at 7:30 AM. The Court's written order to be issued. Supplemental briefing from the Petitioner to be filed no later than May 13, 2025. Respondent's responses to be filed no later than May 15, 2025. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb) |
|
30 | 30
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 05/01 10:59 AM
ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Petitioner's EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 15 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting27 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Oversized Brief. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 4 filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico. (Alden, Holt) |
|
27 | 27
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Oversized Brief filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico. (Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() SUPPLEMENT to Respondent's Opposition to Motion for A Temporary Restraining Order filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc.(Kowal, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 04/22 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 04/07/2025, 8:56 a.m. re Transcript24 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa) |
|
24 | 24
![]() TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/07/2025, 8:56 a.m.. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/13/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2025. (dpa) |
|
23 | 23
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 04/22 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 04/07/2025, 8:56 a.m. re Transcript22 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa) |
|
22 | 22
![]() TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/07/2025, 8:56 p.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/13/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2025. (dpa) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico for Court Reporter.(Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. This matter is set for further hearing on Thursday, May 1, 2025, at 3:30 pm. ( Hearing set for 5/1/2025 at 03:30 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() EXHIBIT Filed filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc. From 4/7/2025 Hearing(Kowal, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney David Kowal on behalf of Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV terminated. (Kowal, David) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MINUTES OF Show Cause Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: RE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER4 . The Court hears arguments. Parties shall file proposed order re briefing dates. Order to Show Cause hearing is continued to Thursday, May 1, 2025, at 3:30 pm. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) |
|
15 | 15
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION to Supplement Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico. (Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting12 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Oversized Brief. The opposition shall be filed. (twdb) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cuauhtemoc Ortega counsel for Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico. Cuauhtemoc Ortega is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe-Cholico. (Ortega, Cuauhtemoc) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 4 filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc.(Kowal, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Oversized Brief filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc. (Kowal, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting3 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Federal Public Defender. The clerk shall add Deputy Federal Public Defender Holt Ortiz Alden to this case as counsel of record. (twdb) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESPONDENTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND by Judge David O. Carter9 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on Petitioners Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is continued to April 7, 2025, at 7:30 a.m. Respondents deadline to respond to the Motion remains April 3, 2025 by 4 p.m., 4 . ( Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2025 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb) Modified on 4/2/2025 (twdb) |
|
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Respondent's Deadline to Respond from April 4, 2025, at 7:30 a.m. to April 7, 2025, at 7:30 a.m. filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe Cholico.(Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSE TO APRIL 4, 2025 AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter6 4 . The Court ORDERS Respondent to respond by 4 p.m. on 4/3/25 and SETS a hearing on Petitioner's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on 4/4/25 at 7:30 a.m. Motion set for hearing on 4/4/2025 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Response to Temporary Restraining Order to April 4, 2025 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 4 filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Lompoc. (Attorney David P Kowal added to party Warden, FCI Lompoc(pty:res)) (Kowal, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
misc
Financial Entry
Tue 04/01 12:06 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Holt Alden. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 . Receipt number 29341. (jji) |
|
attorney
Pay Filing Fee
Tue 04/01 9:24 AM
(Alden, Holt) |
||
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe-Cholico. (Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Appointing Federal Public Defender; Declaration of Counsel filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe-Cholico. (Attorney Holt Ortiz Alden added to party Mauricio Lepe-Cholico(pty:pet)) (Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe-Cholico. (Alden, Holt) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Petitioner Mauricio Lepe-Cholico.(Alden, Holt) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |