Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:25-bk-31816
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC
143 Manor Lakes Estates
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
James Q. Pope
The Pope Law Firm
contact info
Debtor
ROSSLYN2016 LLC
143 Manor Lake Estates Dr.
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
James Q. Pope
The Pope Law Firm
contact info
Debtor
TIMBERS2020 LLC
143 Manor Lake Estates Dr.
Spring, TX 77379
Represented By
James Q. Pope
The Pope Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 11:26 AM CDT
Creditor
City of Houston
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County ESD #11
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County ESD #17
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie L. Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division
Harris County Attorney's Office P.O. Box 2848
Houston, TX 77252
Represented By
Susan R. Fuertes
Harris County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Houston Community College System
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Houston ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lone Star College System
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Morgan Stanley Private Bank, National Association
Represented By
Bethany Simmons
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Vadim J Rubinstein
Loeb And Loeb
contact info
Noah Weingarten
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Creditor
SPRING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND CITY OF HOUSTON
Represented By
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Harris County ESD #28
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Christopher Ross Travis
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
70 70 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Fri 05/16 11:55 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/31/2025, $1487 disbursed (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bank Statement
69 69 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Fri 05/16 11:53 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/31/2025, $4098 disbursed (Filed By TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bank Statement
68 68 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Fri 05/16 11:51 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/31/2025, $8015 disbursed (Filed By TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Bank Statement
67 67 misc Status Report Fri 05/16 11:48 PM
Status Report (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
66 66 misc Status Report Fri 05/16 11:47 PM
Status Report (Filed By TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
65 65 misc Status Report Fri 05/16 11:46 PM
Status Report (Filed By TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
64 64 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/16 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 05/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 62 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Thursday, May 15, 2025
63 63 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/15 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 05/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 52 US Trustee's Notice
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
62 62 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 05/14 1:26 PM
Order Denying Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-] 39
Monday, May 12, 2025
61 61 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 05/12 9:38 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
60 60 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 05/12 9:37 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
59 59 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 05/12 9:36 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
58 58 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 05/12 9:35 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
57 57 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 05/12 9:34 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
56 56 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 05/12 9:33 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders (Filed By TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Declaration Mon 05/12 9:31 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Declaration re: , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
54 54 misc Declaration Mon 05/12 9:29 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Declaration re: , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Declaration Mon 05/12 9:26 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Declaration re: , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
52 52 trustee US Trustee's Notice - Generic (BNC NOTICING) Mon 05/12 10:43 AM
US Trustee's Notice of Hearing and Certificate of Service . (Travis, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Creditor Mailing List Loaded Mon 05/12 9:52 PM
Creditor Mailing List Uploaded by Attorney. (Filed By ROSSLYN2016 LLC, TEXAS ESENCIA 2019 LLC, TIMBERS2020 LLC ). (Pope, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 10, 2025
51 51 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 47 Order Setting Hearing
50 50 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order Setting Hearing
49 49 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/10 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45 Order Setting Hearing