Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Case #: 6:25-cv-00572
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Vincent P. Beilman, III
Wood Smith Henning Berman
contact info
Richard Matthew Singer
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Drew Maris Newman
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Taylor L. Davis
Clyde & Co Us, LLP
contact info
Stephen Berry
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Robert Wayne Fisher
Clyde & Co Us, LLP
contact info
Richard Matthew Singer
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Drew Maris Newman
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Vincent P. Beilman, III
Wood Smith Henning Berman
contact info
Richard Matthew Singer
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Drew Maris Newman
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETPF03921210
Represented By
Vincent P. Beilman, III
Wood Smith Henning Berman
contact info
Richard Matthew Singer
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Drew Maris Newman
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Mediator
Peter Abraham
4070 Laguna Street - First Floor
Coal Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Peter Abraham
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Neal Greenberg
Cohen Law Group
contact info
Jordan Todd Mejeur
Cohen Law Group
contact info
Ryan Smith
Cohen Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
42 42 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/19 4:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 First MOTION to Strike17 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETPF03921210, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Newman, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
41 41 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/14 11:30 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Vincent P. Beilman, Richard M. Singer, and Drew Maris Newman of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order Wed 05/14 9:49 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules, Notices of discovery matters are not to be filed as a matter of routine. Therefore, the filing of the Notice is not authorized. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Docket No. 38 be STRICKEN and removed from the electronic docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/14/2025. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/14 9:47 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 First MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
38 38 notice Compliance notice Tue 05/13 3:42 PM
NOTICE of compliance re35 Case Management Report Deadline for providing mandatory Initial Disclosure pursuant to F.R. 26 by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETPF03921210, United Specialty Insurance Company (Newman, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
37 37 utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 05/12 10:37 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead counsel shall contact opposing Counsel and mediator, schedule mediation conference and file a Notice with the court within 14 days advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. (AKC)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 05/12 10:35 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2025. Discovery due by 3/16/2026 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2026 Pretrial statement due by 7/30/2026 All other motions due by 8/14/2026 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/2/2026 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2026 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 10/5/2026 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/1/2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
35 35 misc Case Management Report Fri 05/09 2:15 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mejeur, Jordan)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 05/09 9:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/9/2025. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 05/08 4:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETPF03921210, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Newman, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
32 32 motion Strike Mon 05/05 2:37 PM
First MOTION to Strike17 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc.. (Smith, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
31 31 motion Strike Thu 05/01 10:07 AM
First MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc.. (Smith, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion to Strike Fri 04/25 9:56 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Endurance's Affirmative Defenses, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, and Motion for Leave to Reply to Affirmative Defenses for failing to comply with Middle District of Florida Local Rule 3.01(g). Plaintiff may file an amended motion on or before May 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/25/2025. (LDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
29 29 motion Strike Thu 04/24 11:44 AM
First MOTION to Strike11 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. (Smith, Ryan) Modified text on 4/24/2025 (KME)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Mon 04/21 7:56 AM
ORDER for Stephen Berry to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/21/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 1:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 4/18/2025. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 12:41 PM
ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. The Clerk shall modify the name of the Defendant to "Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETPF03921210". Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/18/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 3:56 PM
MOTION for Stephen Berry to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23260268 for $150 by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 3:52 PM
MOTION for Robert W. Fisher to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23260193 for $150 by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 04/17 2:35 PM
Amended NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Singer, Richard) Modified on 4/18/2025 to edit text. (FLY)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of appearance Thu 04/17 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Ryan Smith on behalf of Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. (Smith, Ryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 04/17 10:03 AM
STIPULATION Interlineation Amending the Name of Defendant, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. (Mejeur, Jordan) Modified on 4/17/2025 to edit text. (FLY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 4:33 PM
NOTICE by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. Notice of Co-Counsel (Smith, Ryan)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/16 4:08 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Mejeur, Jordan)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Amended document (NOT Motion) Wed 04/16 3:04 PM
AMENDED document by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company. Amendment to15 Notice of a Related Action . (Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/16 2:34 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company.(Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/16 2:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Certain Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number VETGF01239210 for Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company.. (Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/16 2:04 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 04/08 11:43 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc. (Mejeur, Jordan) Modified on 4/8/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/07 8:01 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert Fisher and Stephen Berry Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 3:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Endurance American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Endurance Assurance Corporation, Corporate Parent Endurance U.S. Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Sompo International Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Insurance Inc, Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings U.K. Limited for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 3:09 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company.(Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 04/04 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Taylor L. Davis on behalf of Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Taylor L. Davis. (Davis, Taylor)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/04 2:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Arch Specialty Insurance Company answer or response due 4/17/2025; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London answer or response due 4/17/2025; United Specialty Insurance Company answer or response due 4/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 4/4/2025. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Fri 04/04 12:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/02 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jordan Todd Mejeur on behalf of Sandpoint Condominium Management Association, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jordan T. Mejeur. (Mejeur, Jordan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/02 9:21 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jordan T. Mejeur and Taylor L. Davis of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Interested Persons Order Wed 04/02 9:21 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER for both Plaintiff and Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/2/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 04/01 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard Matthew Singer on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Richard M. Singer. (Singer, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/01 2:27 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:25-cv-572-GAP-UAM. (TNP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/01 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Amended) from 7th Judicial Circuit for Volusia County, Florida, case number 202510467CICI filed in State Court on 02/18/2025. filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, United Specialty Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Newman, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 9 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 10 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/31 6:50 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23190079 filed by All Defendants.(Newman, Drew)
Related: [-]