Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00447
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 7:05 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE INC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
SHANEEKA HARNESS
Represented By
CYNTHIA LYNN GARBER
Onderlaw Llc - Newport Beach Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/08 11:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice of Deficiency - The case caption on the Complaint does not comply with PTO No. 4, MDL No. 3140, and must be corrected by the filing of an Amended Complaint within 14 days. (Amended Complaint due on or before 4/22/2025 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/01 9:24 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re:1 Complaint. For future reference when adding party names during case opening, Alias (dba) "PRASCO LABS" can be added when PRASCO LLC is entered. (Alias has been added to docket) (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/01 8:58 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Filer - Nature of Suit is "367." Citizenship of Defendant is 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names shall be formatted using ALL CAPS and no punctuation unless the punctuation is part of the name. Clerk will correct Nature of Suit, citizenship. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 75 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/31 8:56 PM
COMPLAINT against GREENSTONE INC, PFIZER INC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC, PRASCO LABS, VIATRIS INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9421483.), filed by Shaneeka Harness. (GARBER, CYNTHIA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet