Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Referred: Amelia G Helmick
Case #: 4:25-cv-00112
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 3:25-cv-00058
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Petitioner
JERMAINE EDWARD MCCOY
COWETA COUNTY JAIL 560 GREISON TRAIL
NEWNAN, GA 30263
Respondent
MUSCOGEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Respondent
MUSCOGEE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CLERK


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/18 1:48 PM
Mail Returned-5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to petitioner returned as undeliverable reflecting "Gone" (tlf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/31 3:19 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Helmick issued at the direction of the Court (tlf).
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 03/31 3:16 PM
Case transferred in District Transfer from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00058. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jermaine Edward McCoy re2 Order. (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 ORDER directing that this habeas action be TRANSFERRED to the Columbus Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia for further proceedings. See LR 3.1(B)(4), NDGa. If there are no objections filed within 14 DAYS of the entry of this Order, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this file to the Columbus Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Should objections be filed, the Clerk should await a further Order from the District Court. The Clerk is directed to terminate the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 3/10/2025. (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated. (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
***Set/Clear Flags (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jermaine Edward McCoy re2 Order. (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
***Set/Clear Flags (crh) [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jermaine Edward McCoy.(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 3/31/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet