Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Jonathan E Hawley
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 1:25-cv-01123
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 12:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Breakthru Beverage Illinois LLC
3333 S. Laramie Ave.
Cicero, IL 60804
Plaintiff
Michael J Boylan
Costigan & Wollrab, P.C. 308 E. Washington St.
Bloomington, IL 61701
Represented By
Dawn L Wall
Costigan & Wollrab
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Thu 04/24 3:58 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Mon 03/31 8:12 PM
COMPLAINT of Plaintiff against Breakthru Beverage Illinois LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4704141.), filed by Michael J Boylan.(Wall, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet