Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:25-cv-00568
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 6:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Glenda G McNeal
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Atticus N Tysen
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Mark J Tritton
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Bradley D Tilden
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Eric D Sprunk
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Norse Holdings Inc
Represented By
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Rachel H Herd
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Robert Kingsley Smith
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Tania Matsuoka
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ny)
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Defendant
Nordstrom Inc
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Peter E Nordstrom
Represented By
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Rachel H Herd
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Robert Kingsley Smith
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Tania Matsuoka
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ny)
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Defendant
Erik B Nordstrom
Represented By
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Rachel H Herd
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Robert Kingsley Smith
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Tania Matsuoka
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ny)
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Defendant
Navy Acquisition Co Inc
Represented By
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Rachel H Herd
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Robert Kingsley Smith
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Tania Matsuoka
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ny)
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr (ma)
contact info
Defendant
Guy B Persaud
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Kristen A Green
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
El Puerto de Liverpool SAB de CV
Represented By
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Rachel H Herd
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Stephen Blake
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett (ca)
contact info
Eric McCaffree
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett (ca)
contact info
Defendant
James L Donald
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Defendant
Amie Thuener O'Toole
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Joseph E. Bringman
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Charlotte K. Newell
Sidley Austin Llp (ny)
contact info
Sean C Knowles
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
James Ducayet
Sidley Austin (il)
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Gilbert
Represented By
Reed Kathrein
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (ca)
contact info
Daniel Baker
Block & Leviton Llp (de)
contact info
Lindsay Faccenda
Block & Leviton Llp (de)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Jason Mathew Leviton
Block & Leviton Llp (boston)
contact info
Kimberly A Evans
Block & Leviton Llp (de)
contact info
John Joseph Vielandi
Labaton Keller Sucharow LLP
contact info
Ned Weinberger
Labaton Keller Sucharow Llp (de)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
86 86 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 05/16 11:54 AM
ORDER granting Defendants'75 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (MJV)
Related: [-]
85 85 misc Amended Document Fri 05/16 9:55 AM
AMENDMENT Unsealed Public Version of Declaration of Reed Kathrein in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction to59 Declaration,,,,,,60 Sealed Document,,, by Plaintiff Eric Gilbert(Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 (redacted pursuant to ECF 82),
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 (redacted pursuant to ECF 82),
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37
84 84 misc Amended Document Fri 05/16 9:45 AM
AMENDMENT Unredacted Public Version of Motion for Preliminary Injunction to57 SEALED MOTION to for Preliminary Injunction; re56 MOTION to Seal (partially) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Certain Exhibits ; by Plaintiff Eric Gilbert (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
83 83 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/14 1:20 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants James L Donald, Kristen A Green, Guy B Persaud, Glenda G McNeal, Nordstrom Inc, Amie Thuener O'Toole, Eric D Sprunk, Bradley D Tilden, Mark J Tritton, to75 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction .(Knowles, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
82 82 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 05/12 10:39 AM
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's56 Motion to Seal. Within five (5) court days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for the public docket, redacted as indicated: Plaintiff's Exhibit 29 to the Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein (ECF No.59 ), and Plaintiff's Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein (ECF No.59 ). Within five (5) court days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for the public docket unsealed and unredacted versions of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No.57 ), the Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein (ECF No.59 ), and all exhibits to the Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein (ECF No.59 ) other than Exhibits 29 and 31. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (LH)
Related: [-]