Brown v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Maarten Vermaat |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00358 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:27 AM EDT |
defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
a foreign property casualty insurance company 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Damon Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 20, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 26 Disclosures by plaintiff Damon Brown (Wykoff, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
9 | 9
![]() MINUTES of scheduling conference held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: not recorded) (rmw) |
|
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT (Wykoff, Sarah) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/7/2025 at 02:30 PM at 602 (chambers) Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 4/30/2025; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Graham, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re1 directed to Calhoun County Circuit Court by defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Graham, Joshua) Modified text on 4/2/2025 (mlc) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Sarah Wykoff; attorney admission deadline set for 4/30/2025; (mlc) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (mlc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 04/02 1:46 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case3 sent via U.S. Mail to Sarah Wykoff (mlc) |
||
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Graham, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun Circuit Court case number 2025-472-NZ filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Day, Devin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 04/01 11:50 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7658419 (Day, Devin) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/01 1:08 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Devin Ross Gatfield Day on behalf of defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Day, Devin) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/01 1:10 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Graham on behalf of defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Graham, Joshua) |