Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:25-cv-00637
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Holtec International
Statutory Agent 50 West Broad Street Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Defendant
Orrvilon, Inc.
Corporation Service Company 50 West Broad Street, Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Plaintiff
Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr
835 E Bowman St
Wooster, OH 44691


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 05/01 12:00 PM
Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Holtec International c/o Corporation Services Company, Statutory Agent. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 oth_doc Praecipe Wed 04/23 11:56 AM
Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons upon Holtec International Agent filed by Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr..(Parker, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
6 6 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/23 8:36 AM
Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Holtec International. Service not attempted by certified mail, "return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward", filed on behalf of Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr. Related document(s)4 ,1 . (C,K)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Wed 04/23 8:17 AM
Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Orrvilon, Inc. Service not attempted by certified mail, "return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward", filed on behalf of Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr. Related document(s)4 ,1 . (C,K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 04/02 12:41 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Holtec International and Orrvilon, Inc. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 cmp Petition to Enforce IRS Summons Tue 04/01 2:39 PM
Petition to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed by Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr. (Parker, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons to serve Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to serve Complaint
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 04/01 12:33 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons filed, no summons issued. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 11:35 AM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-13030581. Filed by Hobert Cecil Yount, Jr.. (Parker, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - March 31, 2023 FMLA Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - April 3, 2023 Revised FMLA Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - April 6, 2023 Termination Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - April 5, 2023 Yount Attendance Record,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Orrvilon Records Delivery,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Department of Labor Authorization,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - September 13, 2023 Orrvilon Letter,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Septermber 13, 2023 WHD-382 Designation,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - PA-C Letter to Orrvilon,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - September 17, 2023 Revised FMLA,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - September 25, 2023 Orrvilon Letter,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - September 25, 2023 WHD-382
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/01 12:30 PM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/01 12:31 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (B,DL)
Related: [-]