Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00357
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 8:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Thomas Hazlette
Defendant
Jet Packaging Group, LLC
Defendant
Valorflex Packaging, LLC
Plaintiff
Flexsol Packaging Corp.
Represented By
Todd R. Hambidge
Holland & Knight Llp (nashville)
contact info
Joseph Landon Watson
Holland & Knight (nashville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 3 pgs misc Declaration Thu 04/24 4:19 PM
DECLARATION of Todd R. Hambidge filed by Flexsol Packaging Corp. re:12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Defendants.(Hambidge, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Status Report Pursuant to Servicemembers Civil Relief Act
12 12 2 pgs motion Default (Rule 55(a) Entry of Default) Thu 04/24 4:13 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Flexsol Packaging Corp..(Hambidge, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Certificate of Default
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 10:28 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Flexsol Packaging Corp. Thomas Hazlette served on 4/1/2025. (Hambidge, Todd)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 10:27 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Flexsol Packaging Corp. Jet Packaging Group, LLC served on 4/1/2025. (Hambidge, Todd)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/03 10:26 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Flexsol Packaging Corp. Valorflex Packaging, LLC served on 4/1/2025. (Hambidge, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 12:44 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/2/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 04/01 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/9/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 9:10 AM
Summons issued as to Thomas Hazlette, Jet Packaging Group, LLC, Valorflex Packaging, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 04/01 9:04 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 04/01 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 04/01 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/01 9:29 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Todd R. Hambidge, Joseph Landon Watson admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/01 9:01 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flexsol Packaging Corp. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Thomas Hazlette, Jet Packaging Group, LLC, Valorflex Packaging, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4290873), filed by Flexsol Packaging Corp.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A - Website pages,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B - Unlimited Corporate Guaranty,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C - Personal Guaranty,
Att: 4 29 pgs Exhibit D - Invoices,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E - Redacted 3-24-25 Email,
Att: 6 1 pgs Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet