Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 1:25-cv-00121
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES
Plaintiff
HEATHER CLARK
844 STATE STREET, APT 30
BANGOR, ME 04401


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 order Order on Order to Show Cause Tue 04/29 10:40 AM
ORDER terminating 10 Order to Show Cause. The Plaintiff having now filed an amended complaint sufficiently identifying the basis for diversity jurisdiction, my order to show cause is TERMINATED. The Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service of the amended complaint by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshall shall attempt service by waiver in the first instance. If no waiver is timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for service by the U.S. Marshal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
Related: [-]
misc USM Service Form Tue 04/29 1:16 PM
USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (jam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 9:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES, filed by HEATHER CLARK. (Service of Process Deadline 7/28/2025)(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 email containing document for filing
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 order Order on Order to Show Cause Tue 04/22 5:27 PM
ORDER reserving ruling on 10 Order to Show Cause. In her complaint, the Plaintiff asserted that the Defendant "is a business entity duly organized and existing under the laws of Maine, with its principal place of business in" Bangor, Maine. ECF No. 1 at 2. Because the Plaintiff only asserted state law claims against the Defendant, I ordered her to show cause why her case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The Plaintiff now responds that the Defendant is actually "incorporated under the laws of New Jersey and has its principal place of business in Illinois" and therefore diversity jurisdiction exists. ECF No. 11 at 1. I accept the Plaintiff's correction but hereby ORDER her to file an amended complaint by May 6, 2025, that contains sufficient information to demonstrate the existence of diversity jurisdiction, failing which I will recommend her case be dismissed. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 10:06 AM
In accordance with Judge Wolf's Order dated April 22, 2025; Amended Complaint due by 5/6/2025. (mjlt)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
11 11 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/21 8:29 AM
RESPONSE TO 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by HEATHER CLARK.(slg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Damages,
Att: 2 Email to Clerk's Office,
Att: 3 Email to Clerk's Office
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 motion Order to Show Cause Thu 04/17 2:01 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Insofar as it appears from her pro se complaint, the Plaintiff is a Maine citizen suing a Maine business exclusively under Maine law. See Complaint (ECF No. 1) at 1, 8-14. Without an apparent federal question (i.e., a claim under federal law) or diversity (i.e., claims between citizens of different states), there is no valid basis for this Court (which is a federal district court) to exercise jurisdiction over this matter. See 28 U.S.C. §§ 1331-1332; Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am. , 511 U.S. 375, 377 (1994) ("Federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction....It is to be presumed that a cause lies outside this limited jurisdiction, and the burden of establishing to the contrary rests upon the party asserting jurisdiction. (cleaned up)). Accordingly, the Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing by May 1, 2025, why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Finally, I note that the Plaintiff used the state court application to proceed without payment of fees, see ECF No. 2, so she may have intended to file her complaint in state court. Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (MGW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 04/09 3:08 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON recused. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jam)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 3:14 PM
Case Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 40 pgs misc Additional Attachments Wed 04/02 3:02 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HEATHER CLARK re1 Complaint..(clp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Productive Work Environment Statement,
Att: 2 1 pgs Retaliation Statement,
Att: 3 E-mail Received 4/2/25 to the ECF Inbox
7 7 1 pgs misc Additional Attachments Wed 04/02 2:58 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HEATHER CLARK re1 Complaint..(clp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Review 2,
Att: 2 1 pgs Review 3,
Att: 3 1 pgs Review 4,
Att: 4 Email Received to ECF Inbox 4/2/25
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 1 pgs misc Additional Attachments Tue 04/01 3:32 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HEATHER CLARK re1 Complaint..(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Nicole 2,
Att: 2 1 pgs compliance email,
Att: 3 1 pgs email containing documents for filing
5 5 1 pgs misc Additional Attachments Tue 04/01 3:21 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by HEATHER CLARK re1 Complaint..(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs email part 2,
Att: 2 1 pgs email part 3,
Att: 3 1 pgs email part 4,
Att: 4 1 pgs email part 6,
Att: 5 1 pgs email part 7,
Att: 6 1 pgs email containing docs for filing
4 4 order Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Tue 04/01 2:42 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Pro Se Re First Filing & Address Updates Tue 04/01 2:13 PM
NOTICE: Recently HEATHER CLARK filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (jlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Tue 04/01 2:13 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by HEATHER CLARK (jlm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES with Jury Demand, filed by HEATHER CLARK. (Service of Process Deadline 6/30/2025)(jlm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 H. Clark Investigation,
Att: 2 2024 Intake,
Att: 3 Employment Status