Maryland District Court
Judge:Adam B Abelson
Case #: 1:25-cv-01076
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
CLEARA, LLC
Defendant
RentGrow, Inc.
7 Saint Paul St, Ste 820
Baltimore, MD 21202
Plaintiff
Joshua A. Kropp
Represented By
Jane Santoni
Santoni, Vocci & Ortega, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle A. Simone
Represented By
Jane Santoni
Santoni, Vocci & Ortega, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
16 16 order Order Tue 05/06 2:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon review of the joint status report filed by the parties (ECF No. 15), it is hereby ORDERED that both Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before May 30, 2025. If Defendants move to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall file responses on or before June 30, 2025, and Defendants shall file replies on or before July 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 5/6/2025. (sp6s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 05/05 4:28 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report by RentGrow, Inc. (Zinsner, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/01 3:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The motions to extend time to respond to the complaint (ECF Nos. 6 and 11) are GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by May 30, 2025. By Monday, May 5, 2025, the parties shall file a status report with a joint proposed briefing schedule insofar as Defendants intend to file motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 5/1/2025. (sp6s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 11:29 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John H. Goolsby. Directing attorney John H. Goolsby to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/30 10:02 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, filed by Joshua A. Kropp, Danielle A. Simone.(Santoni, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 3:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cleara, LLC(Sarvadi, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Sarvadi on behalf of Cleara, LLC (Sarvadi, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 10:05 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Goolsby (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11939880.) by Joshua A. Kropp, Danielle A. Simone(Santoni, Jane)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 8:21 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Adam B Abelson. Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. RentGrow, Inc. or counsel for RentGrow, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/12/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 1:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by RentGrow, Inc.(Zinsner, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 04/28 3:36 PM
Deficiency Notice for RentGrow, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/5/2025 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 12:52 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Cleara, LLC, RentGrow, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Cleara, LLC
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Wed 04/02 12:33 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 4/2/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 04/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan. Joshua A. Kropp, Danielle A. Simone or counsel for Joshua A. Kropp, Danielle A. Simone are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/16/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against CLEARA, LLC, RentGrow, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11881450.), filed by Joshua A. Kropp, Danielle A. Simone.(Santoni, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons RentGrow Inc.,
Att: 3 Summons CLEARA, LLC