Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 4:25-bk-40946
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C.
950 County Road 3100
Bonham, TX 75418-9101
Represented By
Brandon John Tittle
Tittle Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:31 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Case (RE: related document(s)6 Notice Of Missing Documents And Notice That Case May Be Dismissed If Documents Are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 4/15/2025. (pr)). (pr)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 order Dismissing Case Tue 04/22 4:16 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. (pr)
Related: [-] 6 Notice Of Missing Documents And Notice That Case May Be Dismissed If Documents Are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 4/15/2025. (pr)
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 8 pgs motion Employ (Nunc Pro Tunc) Wed 04/16 11:33 AM
Application to Employ (Nunc Pro Tunc) Tittle Law Firm, PLLC as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Brandon J. Tittle
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Engagement Letter
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
20 20 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/10 11:30 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Status Hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/29/2025. (af)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 court Status Hearing Subchapter V (11 U.S.C. § 1188) Tue 04/08 3:42 PM
Status Hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/29/2025. (af)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Generic Motion Tue 04/08 1:37 PM
Motion of Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Security Deposit Filed by Frances A. Smith (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 11:46 AM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Frances A. Smith) Filed by Frances A. Smith (Smith, Frances)
Related: [-]
16 16 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Tue 04/08 9:43 AM
Notice To Trustee Frances A. Smith (SBRA V) Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee(Vardeman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Frances A. Smith
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 court Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/04 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice Of Missing Documents And Notice That Case May Be Dismissed If Documents Are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 4/15/2025. (pr)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2025 at 04:30 PM via Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 6/10/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/29/2025. (lc)
13 13 misc Cash Flow Statement Fri 04/04 2:16 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor (CHAPTER 11) Fri 04/04 2:15 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor for Filing Period March 1, 2025 - March 31, 2025 Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Balance Sheet Fri 04/04 2:12 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/03 4:42 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2025 at 04:30 PM via Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 6/10/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/29/2025. (lc)
9 9 15 pgs motion Cash Collateral (Authority To Use) Thu 04/03 4:01 PM
Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Cash Collateral Order
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: John K. Turner) Filed by Fannin CAD (Turner, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/02 4:43 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Notice of Missing Documents to Individual or Non-Individual Debtor (generates Form) Wed 04/02 1:56 PM
Notice Of Missing Documents And Notice That Case May Be Dismissed If Documents Are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 4/15/2025. (pr)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 04/02 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: LINDA REECE) Filed by Bonham ISD Related [+]
Related: [-] ece, Linda
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Wed 04/02 10:00 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2025 at 04:30 PM via Telephonic Dial-In Information at https://www.txeb.uscourts.gov/341info. Proofs of Claims due by 6/10/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/29/2025. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Tue 04/01 3:41 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C., Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/30/2025.Document Due 04/8/2025. filed by Debtor Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C., Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. Document Due 04/8/2025. filed by Debtor Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C., 2 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. filed by Debtor Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C.
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 04/01 3:16 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/01 12:22 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C., Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/30/2025.Document Due 04/8/2025.(Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 04/01 12:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-40946 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13853443, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Tue 04/01 3:15 PM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Crosswind Ranch Enterprises, L.L.C. Document Due 04/8/2025. (Tittle, Brandon)
Related: [-]